DISPENSAIRE FRANCAIS-SOCIETE FRANCAISE DE BIENFAISANCE FRENCH CLINIC AND FRENCH BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES MEDICAL CARE AND SOCIAL SUPPORT TO THE FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY IN NEED RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 August 2008: Standard registration
- DISPENSAIRE FRANCAIS - THE FRENCH CLINIC (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivier Nicolay | Chair | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Palmer | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Chermette | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Salima Schreiter | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Munoz Bargados | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LAMIREL | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
odile Lombard Mourre | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CECILE D'ANGELIN | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Elisabeth Maxwell | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIGITTE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIORA DELIA MATHILDE MALLEVAYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENT HENRI EMILE DEBACKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ODILE LHOPITALLIER MD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.00k | £178.20k | £206.92k | £329.73k | £336.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.02k | £213.76k | £204.21k | £210.26k | £275.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JAN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 JUL 2014 null as amended on 13 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS ARE TO: A) RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ASSIST FRENCH SPEAKING PATIENTS UNABLE TO ACCESS NHS SERVICES, TO CONSULT GPS AND OTHER MEDICAL SPECIALISTS WHO ARE FRENCH SPEAKERS AND WORK ON A VOLUNTARY BASIS; AND TO ASSIST THEM WITH THE PROCESS OF REGISTRATION WITH THE NHS; B) RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING TO FRENCH SPEAKERS LIVING IN THE UK, MEDICAL AND HEALTH RELATED CONSULTATIONS, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND COUNSELLING AND TO ASSIST FRENCH SPEAKERS WHO MAY BE PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN NEED OF HELP BY PROVIDING SOCIAL CARE AND SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE FORM OF COUNSELLING, ADVICE, VISITS AND TEMPORARY FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LE DISPENSAIRE FRANCAIS
184 HAMMERSMITH ROAD
LONDON
W6 7DJ
- Phone:
- 02082228822
- Email:
- info@df-sfb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window