FRIENDS OF KIMBLE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide for the school and its pupils and staff. Arranging events to enhance community links and parental inclusion with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Goodhew | Chair | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Pavel | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ing | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Prior | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steph Hares | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Marshall | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Davidson Audley | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jones | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Smith | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £10.02k | £8.32k | £5.68k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.35k | £35.89k | £6.10k | £6.48k | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BUCKINGSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Kimble C of E School
Church Lane
Great Kimble
AYLESBURY
HP17 9TH
- Phone:
- 01844346189
- Email:
- friendsofkimble@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window