NEWBIGGIN ARTS FORUM LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings including a workshop, speaker and notices. Annual summer arts event. Other seasonal events. Hosting of other activities, such as Highlights Theatre events, guest speakers, workshops etc. Running a building with tennants, ad-hoc room rentals and an exhibition space. Sub groups specialising in photography, creative writing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 29 July 2008: Standard registration
- 15 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £30.81k | £51.61k | £16.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £28.50k | £35.68k | £33.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 29 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 05 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS LIVING OR WORKING IN NEWBIGGIN-BY-THE-SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") IN ALL FORMS OF THE ARTS AND CREATIVE ACTIVITY AND THEREBY ENCOURAGING A WIDER APPRECIATION OF VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A COMMUNITY FORUM PROMOTING INFORMATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES TO SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NEWBIGGIN-BY-THE-SEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window