HEBRON CHRISTIAN FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion by the proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of God, in accordance with the Church's Statement of Faith through activities such as Sunday Services, Mid-week Bible Study, Men/Women's Ministry, Evangelism, Relief to the poor and vulnerable, Weekly Youth Meetings, Annual Marriage Conference and other such activities as the Trustees deem appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 July 2008: Standard registration
- HEBRON CHRISTIAN FAITH CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Quintanilla | Chair |
|
||||||
Laurence Harris | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Hien | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.22k | £346.96k | £404.40k | £434.11k | £439.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315.05k | £252.18k | £300.33k | £335.21k | £381.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WEST MIDLANDS, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Primrose Drive
BEDWORTH
CV12 0GL
- Phone:
- 02476645980
- Email:
- info@hebroncfc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window