Financial history MINDS FOR HEALTH

Charity Number: 1126559
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/09/2010 16/09/2011 16/09/2012 16/09/2013 16/09/2014
Total gross income £2.55k £6.02k £8.10k £2.94k £2.76k
Total expenditure £1.01k £512 £12.82k £5.02k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A