Financial history APOLLO MUSIC PROJECTS

Charity number: 1124784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £168.78k £199.83k £177.24k £245.73k £251.09k
Total expenditure £136.11k £198.32k £217.77k £228.25k £261.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.03k £12.00k £1.50k N/A