APOLLO MUSIC PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carried out an extensive programme for primary and special schools in north and east London boroughs comprising classroom sessions, school assemblies, orchestral workshops and a schools concert at Hackney Empire for all participating schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brent
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 02 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Anne Bremner | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Maxine Tyler | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Yana | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kenneth Melling | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peter Curtis | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Hoggart | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.78k | £199.83k | £177.24k | £245.73k | £251.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.11k | £198.32k | £217.77k | £228.25k | £261.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.03k | £12.00k | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS AMONGST CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN HACKNEY AND TOWER HAMLETS, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 CLIFDEN ROAD
LONDON
E5 0LL
- Phone:
- 02089864101
- Email:
- info@apollomusicprojects.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window