Accounts and annual returns GLENDALE PLAYGROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1124480
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 06 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 21 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 06 March 2013 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted