Financial history People First Keighley & Craven

Charity number: 1125278
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £84.97k £142.08k £173.69k £221.41k £174.48k
Total expenditure £104.62k £136.49k £124.85k £125.44k £202.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.79k £46.70k £47.47k N/A £127.00k