People First Keighley & Craven

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A self Advocacy Charity run by and for adults with learning disabilities to break down barriers and bring people together train groups of professionals about what a learning disability is and meet with service providers to talk about our issues.organise events and raise funds to keep the charity running Hold social events throughout the year We are also a accredited training centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £126,997 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 July 2008: Standard registration
- PEOPLE FIRST KEIGHLEY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Longbottom | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Brundle | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WHITESIDE | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lines | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TOM WALSH | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.97k | £142.08k | £173.69k | £221.41k | £174.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.62k | £136.49k | £124.85k | £125.44k | £202.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.79k | £46.70k | £47.47k | N/A | £127.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
19 August 2024 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 2007 AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2008 as amended on 01 Apr 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES INCLUDING ENABLING THEM TO MANAGE A VOLUNTARY GROUP, SPEAK UP FOR THEMSELVES AND GO ON SOCIAL OUTINGS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 26
Central Hall
Alice Street
KEIGHLEY
West Yorkshire
BD21 3JD
- Phone:
- 01535 607222
- Email:
- admin@peoplefirstkc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window