EXETER ROYAL ACADEMY FOR DEAF EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of a School which educates students aged 5 to 16 years and a Further Education College providing post 16 education. Both the School and College offer residential and day placements to deaf young people. The Charity also operates a Children's Home for deaf young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£6,503,339
Donations and legacies | £258.89k | |
Charitable activities | £6.11m | |
Other trading activities | £42.07k | |
Investments | £27.23k | |
Other | £69.80k |
Total expenditure:
£6,257,133
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.26m | |
Other | £0 |
-£5,317 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,976,857 from 32 government contract(s) and £112,653 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.26m | |
Retained for future use | £246.21k |
People

127 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- the Deaf Academy (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Angela Mary Pedder | Chair | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Madeleine Heather Collie | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Stephens MBE | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jane Papworth | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||
DAVID BALFOUR ROBERTSON | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert Harold Spencer | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Collyer | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kenneth Alexander | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhodri Giles Davey | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Alistair Dewhirst | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80m | £5.36m | £5.46m | £5.83m | £6.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29m | £4.90m | £5.24m | £5.46m | £6.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.09m | £4.02m | £4.82m | £5.33m | £5.98m | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.08k | £107.73k | £169.72k | £106.02k | £112.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.22k | £907.93k | £388.31k | £302.19k | £258.89k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £43.29k | £36.26k | £41.67k | £38.34k | £42.07k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.74m | £4.15m | £5.00m | £5.44m | £6.11m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £34.35k | £8.61k | £2.68k | £5.21k | £27.23k | |
|
Income - Other | £10.67k | £258.48k | £25.77k | £38.88k | £69.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £659 | £803 | £232.52k | £285.00k | £137.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.12m | £4.71m | £5.24m | £5.45m | £6.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £167.67k | £189.67k | £6.09k | £6.09k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.48k | £26.33k | £32.26k | £39.46k | £39.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £115 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.72m | £17.60m | £17.56m | £17.09m | £18.45m | |
|
Long-term investments | £270.61k | £52.26k | £61.95k | £64.09k | £57.51k | |
|
Other assets | £5.96m | £1.31m | £1.01m | £2.21m | £1.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£8.43m | -£9.31m | -£9.75m | -£1.37m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.23m | £3.57m | £2.78m | £2.82m | £3.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2017 as amended on 11 May 2018 as amended on 28 Aug 2018 as amended on 31 Jan 2020 as amended on 31 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE:- 3.1. TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING, CARE, ACCOMMODATION, LEISURE OPPORTUNITIES, WELFARE AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES TO DEAF PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT DEAF BUT WHO, DUE TO SOME OTHER DISABILITY, WOULD BENEFIT FROM THE SAME (PRINCIPALLY THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM THE COUNTIES OF DEVON, CORNWALL, SOMERSET AND DORSET) WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PERSONAL, MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITIES AND SOCIETY AS A WHOLE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; AND 3.2. TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS AND CAPABILITIES OF DEAF PEOPLE WITH A VIEW TO ACHIEVING GREATER INTEGRATION BETWEEN DEAF AND HEARING COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTIES OF DEVON, CORNWALL, SOMERSET AND DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Deaf Academy
1 Douglas Avenue
EXMOUTH
EX8 2AU
- Phone:
- 01395 203130
- Email:
- info@thedeafacademy.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window