Accounts and annual returns RESURRECTION POWER AND LIVING BREAD MINISTRIES CROYDON

Charity number: 1124526
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 April 2024 22 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2024 22 February 2025 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2023 03 July 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2023 03 July 2024 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2022 22 June 2023 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2022 22 June 2023 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2020 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2020 21 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window