SEA - CHANGE PROJECTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SEA-CHANGE PROVIDES ACTIVITY-BASED LEARNING WITH ACCREDITATION WHERE POSSIBLE TO YOUNG PEOPLE, VULNERABLE ADULTS AND OTHERS BY LIVING AND WORKING TOGETHER ABOARD A TRADITIONAL SAILING VESSEL AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2008: Standard registration
- SEA-CHANGE SAILING TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Halajko | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lucian Bernard Hawkes | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Allan James | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Murray Stubbs | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Robinson | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM THOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BOWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR FRANCIS DOUGLAS MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.24k | £87.84k | £158.76k | £60.05k | £150.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.11k | £94.82k | £111.30k | £125.43k | £146.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED 14 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAILING OR SAILING RELATED ACTIVITIES AND OTHER TRAINING SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downs Road Boatyard
19a Downs Road
MALDON
CM9 5HG
- Phone:
- 01621840982
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window