SUPPORTING DALIT CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Dalit Children funds the education and medical expenses of Dalit ('untouchable') children. We also fund social projects to help Dalit children and their families. The charity is run voluntarily, there are no salaries. All donations are sent directly to the schools, university and health centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 22 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dinah Findlay | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Madeleine Kate Baron | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Findlay | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Findlay | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.72k | £172.87k | £167.55k | £134.03k | £182.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.72k | £172.87k | £167.55k | £134.06k | £179.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2022 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 May 2022 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DALIT CHILDREN LIVING IN KARNATAKA, SOUTHERN INDIA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF DALIT CHILDREN LIVING IN KARNATAKA, SOUTHERN INDIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING TOWARDS THEIR LIVING EXPENSES.
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FILLETTS FARM
STANSTEAD ROAD
HUNSDON
WARE
SG12 8QA
- Phone:
- 07909705125
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window