Kirkgate Community Centre

Charity number: 1124408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Kirkgate Centre is a Community centre based in Shipley, West Yorkshire. Our main activities include providing a meeting place, resources and support to community groups, voluntary organisations and other groups working with the community. We develop new activities and services for community benifit. We also provide additional services for older people including social day care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £115,826
Total expenditure: £121,017

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE KIRKGATE CENTRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nathan Tanswell Chair 21 February 2023
None on record
Tamsin Treasurer-Jones Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Grace Reid Trustee 19 December 2023
None on record
Kathryn Williams Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Jennifer Ann Painter Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
John Henkel Trustee 20 April 2021
SALTAIRE COMMUNITY FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Matthew Bradshaw Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £222.45k £175.87k £174.13k £164.74k £115.83k
Total expenditure £204.80k £115.96k £142.74k £184.54k £121.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £96.57k N/A £40.12k £41.44k £35.33k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kirkgate Centre
39a Kirkgate
Shipley
West Yorkshire
BD18 3EH
Phone:
01274 580186