NAVRATRI FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise a religious & cultural activity for the duration of 10 - 15 days during the year during the monthe os Sept / Oct as per the Lunar calender. The event is organised at a public venue hired each year. This is an annual event only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 19 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Chauhan | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mahesh Hathi | Trustee | 30 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Premji Mavji Arjan | Trustee | 30 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hemant Patel | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.53k | £4.16k | £45.07k | £58.07k | £63.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.20k | £6.96k | £42.95k | £43.16k | £63.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
04 December 2020 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION BY THE PERFORMANCE OF AN ANNUAL NAVARATI RELIGIOUS FESTIVAL; THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE EDUCATION OF INDIAN CHILDREN WITH REGARD TO THEIR CULTURAL HERITAGE; AND TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Cocksfoot Drive
Mossley
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL5 9JA
- Phone:
- 01457834412
- Email:
- ydassociates@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window