Financial history THE GORDON SANDERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125802
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £71.51k £105.00k £90.00k £112.03k £78.27k
Total expenditure £78.52k £96.48k £94.51k £111.94k £74.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A