THE GORDON SANDERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The use of funds to meet international, national and local appeals, including individual appeals if relevant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 10 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON GEORGE SANDERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN VENTHAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.51k | £105.00k | £90.00k | £112.03k | £78.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.52k | £96.48k | £94.51k | £111.94k | £74.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, ODIES, ORGANISATIONS AFFECTED. 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITIES AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Lincoln Way
MALDON
Essex
CM9 6GL
- Phone:
- 07767226446
- Email:
- Michael@mjv.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window