Financial history TRENT BRIDGE COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1124425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £247.18k £205.71k £332.72k £563.29k £706.90k
Total expenditure £230.94k £209.28k £367.06k £524.65k £573.80k
Income from government contracts £192.00k N/A £288.46k £370.91k £512.58k
Income from government grants N/A £192.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £11.41k £9.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £546.32k £693.21k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.95k £4.44k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.61k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £516.98k £555.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £7.52k £18.18k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £8.26k £19.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £149 £0