NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (JUNIORS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop more extended relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school Engage in activities which advance the education of the pupils by supporting the school Provide and assist in the provision of facilities for the education at the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 September 2008: Standard registration
- THE ORME HOUSE (NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME SCHOOL) PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Brian Durber | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Machin | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Eagle | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hartley | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Capella McNamara | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £0 | £11.97k | £24.31k | £15.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.13k | £0 | £5.61k | £5.73k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2015 as amended on 11 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME JUNIOR SCHOOL
BANKSIDE
NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST5 1BQ
- Phone:
- 01782664616
- Email:
- NuLSPAJuniors@nuls.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window