BLIND LIFE IN DURHAM

Charity number: 1124381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide social activities that include social meetings and accessible sports. Other activities include group days out, regular virtual meetings, technology support and mentoring. We also produce a monthly newsletter in various formats. All the venues we use are suitable for disabled access.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £10,517
Total expenditure: £24,349

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR JAMES WELCH Chair
None on record
Rhona Mary Cross Trustee 02 July 2024
None on record
MR MICHAEL GANDY Trustee
None on record
MAUREEN ELIZABETH GANDY Trustee
None on record
MARGARET WELCH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £34.54k £17.84k £41.04k £19.43k £10.52k
Total expenditure £27.78k £18.34k £25.37k £27.41k £24.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 June 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 BROOKSIDE AVENUE
CROOK
DL15 8LB
Phone:
01388764528