Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S WINCHFIELD

Charity number: 1124379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.13k £2.96k £3.60k £4.24k £3.83k
Total expenditure £3.83k £1.50k £7.63k £467 £4.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A