Financial history THE LORD'S PENTECOSTAL CHURCH INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1125290
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £5.50k £9.63k £6.87k £7.00k £0
Total expenditure £4.55k £5.63k £4.97k £3.76k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0