THE LIGHT AND LIFE FULL GOSPEL FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL. WE PROVIDE MEANINGFUL TIMES OF WORSHIP AND OPPORTUNITES FOR FELLOWSHIP FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, THROUGH SUNDAY SCHOOL, YOUTH GROUP, SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB, THE LIGHT & LIFE SUPPORT GROUP, SUMMER HOLIDAY CLUB. SEMINARS FOR MEN & WOMEN COVERING VARIOUS TOPICS INCLUDING DOMESTIC ABUSE, FINANCE AND HEALTH ISSUES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lambeth
- Jamaica
Governance
- 18 June 2008: Standard registration
- 04 April 2012: Funds received from 283804 THE LIGHT AND LIFE FULL GOSPEL FELLOWSHIP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET SIMPSON | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DWAYNE ROWE | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
NORA ROBERTS | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MERNA BONNICK | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev HERMA BUTTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.75k | £136.63k | £170.34k | £219.52k | £216.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.67k | £108.80k | £100.49k | £160.73k | £168.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/01/2008 as amended on 09 Dec 2021 as amended on 13 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 The Objects of the Church are: 2.1.1 the advancement of the Christian religion in particular by the propagation of the gospel; 2.1.2 to help young people especially but not exclusively through leisure time activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals, as members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved; and 2.1.3 the prevention and relief of poverty, in particular but not exclusively in the London Borough of Lambeth, by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LIGHT & LIFE FULL GOSPEL FELLOW
105-111 LANDOR ROAD
LONDON
SW9 9RR
- Phone:
- 02072741157
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window