CHRISTIAN RESTORATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child sponsorship, Healthcare, Micro Finance projects, Medical Support, Disabilty support, School building projects, Short term Mission trips, Sponsorship for disadvantaged adults, social housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 July 2008: Standard registration
- CRMI Children of Hope (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Fasipe | Chair | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Aladiran | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nick Johnstone | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Bunjo | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BOOTH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.98k | £364.21k | £270.90k | £313.65k | £253.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.56k | £348.87k | £283.50k | £302.44k | £246.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN UGANDA, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE POOR, ORPHANED OR SICK. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN UGANDA, PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH CLINICS. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK, UGANDA, AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Message Trust
Lancaster House
Harper Road
Sharston
MANCHESTER
M22 4RG
- Phone:
- 0161 987 2764
- Email:
- office@childrenofhope.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window