AL-FAROOQ TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Provision Of Religious Education -Arrange and hold religious gatherings -Establish mosques and religious education schools and run them successfully -Hold prayer meetings -Provide marriage counselling service -Engage people in the community on daily basis to influence them to practice their faith and have good moral character -work with other community groups to promote community cohesion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 17 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASIF KHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DR MOHAMMED ALI ASGHAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED MANSHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM RAVAT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED JAMIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.28k | £184.91k | £200.29k | £276.75k | £261.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.93k | £161.16k | £183.38k | £167.57k | £251.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM [WHILST ADHERING STRICTLY AND ONLY TO THE DOCTRINE, FRAMEWORK AND METHODOLOGY OF THE TABLIGHI JAMAAT AS DEFINED BY THE ELDERS OF DEWSBURY MARKAZ; WHICH MUST BE STRICTLY IN ADHERENCE WITH THE AHLUS-SUNNAH-WAL-JAMA'AH (NECESSARILY IN ALIGHTMENT WITH THE HANAFI FIQH ONLY) ACCORDING TO ULAMA-E-DEOBAND AS DESCRIBED IN THEIR BOOK 'ALMOHANNED'.] B TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGAE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. C TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS, SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT IN DERBY, BURTON, NOTTINGHAM AND MANSFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS OR OF RACIAL ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS. D TO PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
DERBY, BURTON, NOTTINGHAM AND MANSFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid Al-Farooq
107 Mill Hill Lane
Derby
Derbyshire
DE23 6SB
- Phone:
- 07801348963
- Email:
- masjidalfarooquk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window