CANCERVIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a help-line and self-help groups for the family, friends and colleagues of people diagnosed with cancer.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 September 2008: Standard registration
- 09 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 April 2010: Funds transferred to 1133541 CANCERVIVE
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER. IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS AND A TELEPHONE HELPLINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window