Accounts and annual returns YOUNG SINGERS WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125420
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 05 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 February 2011 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required