YOUNG SINGERS WELFARE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Young Singers' Welfare Foundation supports UK-based professional classical singers under the age of 40 who suffer financial hardship as a result of a serious medical condition or illness. The support given is in the form of either a one-off grant, or payment for items, services or facilities, and we also operate a referral service to other organisations who may be able to assist an applicant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
- 24 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.14k | £21.85k | £14.63k | £10.24k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £8.12k | £9.02k | £6.88k | £9 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 16 February 2011 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP CAUSED BY SERIOUS MEDICAL CONDITIONS OR ILLNESSES AMONG SELF-EMPLOYED PROFESSIONAL CLASSICAL SINGERS UNDER THE AGE OF 40 WHO ARE PERMANENTLY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY MAKING ONE-OFF GRANTS OF MONEY, OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window