THE STONEBRIDGE CITY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established 35 years ago with and for disadvantaged people, including those experiencing social/school/workplace exclusion, learning/physical disabilities or difficulties, mental health problems or worklessness. We provide support, training and therapeutic interaction with the animals and gardens. We are a free visitor attraction encouraging interaction between our beneficiaries and visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
280 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 July 2008: Standard registration
- 15 May 2012: Funds received from 508565 THE STONEBRIDGE FARM ASSOCIATION
- THE STONEBRIDGE FARM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Roughan-Cook | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jeffries | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Roughan-Cook | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Smallpiece | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Stevenson | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.53k | £534.47k | £512.78k | £483.95k | £493.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £393.17k | £397.25k | £416.03k | £537.41k | £559.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.96k | £87.54k | £13.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £347.45k | £210.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £186.86k | £301.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £156 | £114 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £70.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £397.25k | £415.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £381 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £8.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/02/2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE TRAINING, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL AND OCCUPATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAM, GREATER NOTTINGHAM, AND SURROUNDING AREA. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER NOTTINGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND/OR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFECT TO ADVANCE TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE INHABITANTS AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE ECONOMIC REGENERATION OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, DISADVANTAGE IN THE LABOUR MARKET, YOUTH, AGE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. ADVANCE THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF SAID INHABITANTS USING THE MEDIA OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN PRINCIPLES OF SELF-DISCIPLINE AND OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THEIR SOCIAL, ECONOMIC, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE ARE IMPROVED. PROMOTE AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF AREA OF BENEFIT HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY EDUCATING THEM IN THE CARE OF AND CONSIDERATION OF ALL LIVING THINGS AND FOR THESE PURPOSES TO CARE FOR ANIMALS AND GROUNDS SO THAT THE IMMEDIATE BENEFICIARIES OF THE PROJECT AND THE PUBLIC WILL HAVE A GREATER AWARENESS OF AND APPRECIATION FOR LIVING THINGS. PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISADVANTAGE IN THE LABOUR MARKET, PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY OR BY REASON OF BEING A NON-TRADITIONAL LEARNER OR RETURNER TO LEARNING SO AS TO CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR APPROPRIATE PROGRESSION TOWARDS EMPLOYMENT OR GREATER AWARENESS OF AND APPRECIATION FOR LIVING THINGS. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL AND LEARNING DISABILITIES, MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS OR OTHER HIGH SUPPORT NEEDS TO ACCESS HIGH QUALITY THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES, AND TO PROVIDE WHOSE FACILITIES FOLLOWING CONTEMPORARY GOOD PRACTICE WITH REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF SAID PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM, GREATER NOTTINGHAM, AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STONEBRIDGE CITY FARM
STONEBRIDGE ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 2FR
- Phone:
- 01159505113
- Email:
- info@stonebridgecityfarm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window