Financial history INTERCESSORS MINISTRIES OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 1124574
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/05/2020 08/05/2021 08/05/2022 08/05/2023 08/05/2024
Total gross income £23.43k £23.58k £31.86k £29.67k £22.58k
Total expenditure £25.91k £16.04k £21.77k £47.40k £33.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A