INTERCESSORS MINISTRIES OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prayer Meetings, Seminars, Worship services, counselling, Hospital Visitations, Evangelism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- United States
Governance
- 18 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANE HOLDEN | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev RAYMOND TETTEH ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BISHOP FRANCIS GOSPEL BOAMPONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/05/2020 | 08/05/2021 | 08/05/2022 | 08/05/2023 | 08/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.43k | £23.58k | £31.86k | £29.67k | £22.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.91k | £16.04k | £21.77k | £47.40k | £33.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 7 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND BY PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND RECORDED MATERIAL TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 HONLEY ROAD
LONDON
SE6 2HZ
- Phone:
- 02082325462
- Email:
- imogb@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
intercessorsministries.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window