Accounts and annual returns AMSER JUSTIN TIME - ELUSEN CANCR PANCREAS CYMRU/PANCREATIC CANCER CHARITY WALES

Charity Number: 1124951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 April 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window