Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TWYFORD ST MARY'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1124409
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 July 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 July 2024 9 days late
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 October 2023 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required