Accounts and annual returns THE HAMPSTEAD VILLAGE SHUL

Charity number: 1124605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window