WESTBROOK LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising through school fairs, DVD production, discos, bun sales and quiz nights

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,535
Total expenditure: £5,799

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WESTBROOK LANE PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Crosland Trustee 02 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.63k £1.82k £1.82k £3.54k £7.54k
Total expenditure £632 £5.44k £5.44k £1.72k £5.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 September 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 September 2023 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WESTBROOK LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL
WESTBROOK LANE
HORSFORTH
LEEDS
LS18 5AH
Phone:
01132587913
Website:

No information available