Accounts and annual returns SAPPHIRE SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS LTD

Charity number: 1124906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window