Financial history SAPPHIRE SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS LTD

Charity number: 1124906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £598.34k £592.67k £667.18k £724.74k £662.31k
Total expenditure £629.19k £595.51k £557.82k £610.39k £729.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.20k £207.28k £10.92k £10.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20k £190.50k £207.28k £10.92k £0
Income - Other trading activities £243 £55 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £595.91k £401.13k £459.47k £712.63k £659.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £987 £988 £440 £799 £3.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £389 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £629.19k £595.51k £557.82k £610.39k £729.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0