THE FRIENDS OF PRESTOLEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to support Prestolee Primary School and promoting social activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
Governance
- 18 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Ingham | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Charlton | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TONGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £1.77k | £2.05k | £1.17k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £380 | £420 | £291 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
BY DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
BOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH ROAD
RADCLIFFE
MANCHESTER
M26 1HJ
- Phone:
- 01204331521
- Email:
- prestolee@prestoleetrust.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window