NATIONAL CATTLE MOBILITY EVENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The NCME's objective is to advance the education and training of farmers and allied professions in the subject of cattle mobility. The annual National Cattle Mobility Event is the main conduit for this education and training. The last event was held in April 2011.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2008: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 April 2012: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA SPEED BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
OWEN ATKINSON | Trustee | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID NIXON LOGUE PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Lindsay Heasman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR NICHOLAS JAMES BELL MA VETMB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY JANE NODEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW DOBBS BVM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £801 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.84k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 385 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 385 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 751 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 751 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1116 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1116 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1481 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1481 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 19 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF FARMERS AND ALLIED PROFESSIONS IN THE SUBJECT OF CATTLE MOBILITY, WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING THE INCIDENCE OF LAMENESS IN CATTLE IN THE UK, AND THEREBY IMPROVING ANIMAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTPOINT FARM VETS
MAIDSTONE ROAD
ASHFORD
TN24 8TY
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- info@cattlemobility.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window