GOSPEL BROADCASTING IN PORTUGUESE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN OBJECT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THROUGH BROADCASTING THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN PORTUGUESE. THIS IS TO BE BY MEANS OF THE DISSEMINATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGH THE MEDIA OF RADIO, INTERNET, TAPE, COMPACT DISC, LITERATURE, MISSIONARIES AND MISSIONARY WORK IN THE PORTUGUESE LANGUAGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Angola
- Brazil
- Mozambique
- Portugal
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL JOHN FOUNDLING | Chair | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
DENNIS CHARLES BUTLER | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
EUNICE FOUNDLING | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILIP NORMAN KIMBER | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
HAROLD JOHN LEE BSC | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £850 | £725 | £600 | £275 | |
|
Total expenditure | £918 | £4.21k | £40 | £2.24k | £262 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THROUGH BROADCASTING THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN PORTUGUESE. THIS IS TO BE BY MEANS OF THE DISSEMINATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGH THE MEDIA OF RADIO, INTERNET, TAPE, COMPACT DISC, LITERATURE, MISSIONARIES AND MISSIONARY WORK IN THE PORTUGUESE LANGUAGE. THE SUBSIDIARY OBJECTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE MAIN OBJECT ARE TO FINANCIALLY SUPPORT MISSIONARIES AND MISSIONARY WORK TO THE PORTUGUESE SPEAKING PEOPLE OF THE WORLD AND TO PAY FOR THE TRANSLATION OF GOSPEL MESSAGES INTO THE PORTUGUESE LANGUAGE AND THE COST OF PURCHASE, COMPILATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE SAME AND ANY EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES WHICH ARE REASONABLY NECESSARY TO MEET THESE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Inglewood Drive
Bognor Regis
PO21 4JX
- Phone:
- 01243263966
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window