Financial history FRESH WATER MINISTRIES UK

Charity Number: 1126103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £26.83k £25.87k £14.51k £18.39k £18.30k
Total expenditure £25.14k £20.63k £18.79k £19.50k £18.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A