Financial history SPAJERS

Charity number: 1125107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.49k £4.49k £11.44k £27.19k £28.35k
Total expenditure £19.48k £7.71k £10.92k £18.21k £21.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A