RWANDA ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need and suffering through healthcare, education and training, housing and general welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rwanda
Governance
- 21 June 2008: Standard registration
- 29 June 2023: Funds received from 1172079 WETHERBY SCHOOLS CHARITY
- RWANDA AID (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Alan Giles | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Henchoz | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane O'Brien | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deanne Thomas | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Gelling OBE | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wright | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA ELIZABETH MESSIAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.22k | £313.40k | £203.05k | £315.76k | £53.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.27k | £447.72k | £348.96k | £295.92k | £112.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE as amended on 14 Dec 2019 as amended on 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are to relieve poverty in Rwanda, particularly in the Western Province, to advance education and to provide relief in the country to those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability or financial hardship. The Charity aims to achieve this by working with the government and local communities in Rwanda to identify the most pressing challenges and then piloting sustainable initiatives to address those challenges. In particular the Charity promotes effective education, vocational and farm training and enterprise. It also supports inclusivity particularly for those on the margins of society, especially street children and young people living with disability.
Area of benefit
RWANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bugsell Farm
Bugsell Lane
ROBERTSBRIDGE
East Sussex
TN32 5EN
- Phone:
- 07714659508
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window