BAITHUL MAMUR JAM E MASJID MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Religious activities Conducting regular prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
- 07 March 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.34k | £9.93k | £7.48k | £5.18k | £680 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.57k | £11.74k | £7.71k | £5.33k | £706 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SOUTH TYNESIDE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS.
Area of benefit
TYNESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window