INCLUDE ME TOO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity is to support disabled children and young people and their families from Black, Asian & Ethnic Minority Families & marginalised communities backgrounds supporting participation, representation ensuring their needs are understood and supported.Also championing,promoting and supporting ALL disabled children and young people's rights and entitlements. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN SUDOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Kanda | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jaskanwaljit Garcha-Davies | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cairen Dheensa | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Raj Jhamat | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS PARMI DHEENSA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.40k | £188.29k | £144.77k | £126.51k | £56.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.03k | £153.83k | £126.47k | £123.13k | £80.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £24.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 2008 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND SPECIAL NEEDS IN THE UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: THE PROVISION OF WORKING LINKS WITH GROUPS PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO , THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITY, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND SPECIAL NEEDS. THE PROVISION OF LINKAGE BETWEEN PARENTS WITH CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND SPECIAL NEEDS TO ENABLE SUCH PARENTS AND CARERS TO SHARE EXPERIENCES, TO HIGHLIGHT THEIR DIFFICULTIES AND BARRIERS AND THEREBY TO PROVIDE CARE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PARENTS AND CARERS. 1
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWHAMPTON ARTS CENTRE
DUNKLEY STREET
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 4AN
- Phone:
- 01902711604
- Email:
- im2@includemetoo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window