WESTON ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1125021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRUE RELIGIOUS GUIDELINES FROM THE HOLY QURAN AND HADITH (SAYING OF PROPHET PEACE BE UPON HIM)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,851
Total expenditure: £25,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR SYED GIOFUR Trustee
None on record
ANWAR HUSSAIN Trustee
None on record
MOHAMMED ABULAIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.78k £264.80k £44.10k £58.94k £41.85k
Total expenditure £27.06k £262.92k £30.30k £27.86k £25.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.84k £502 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
66 Palmer Street
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 1RU
Phone:
07837917840
Website:

No information available