Financial history SUGGEST IN SALFORD LIMITED

Charity number: 1124721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.16k £9.62k £8.80k £9.13k £8.51k
Total expenditure £14.06k £14.22k £9.00k £9.50k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A