Accounts and annual returns UNITED RELIGIONS INITIATIVE UK

Charity number: 1124863
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 January 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 January 2019 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 18 October 2017 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required