BEC SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and enrichment of the students at Burnside Business and Enterprise College by providing and assisting in extra facilities/resources, supporting extra-curricular training, financing school trips and buying resources to celebrate achievement. All of the above types of expenditure are beyond that provided by the LEA and extra to that required by the curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 23 June 2008: Standard registration
- Burnside Business & Enterprise College (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Swain | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jamieson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WATSON | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND ROBERT WELCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON CLAIRE THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.71k | £2.72k | £39.75k | £75.48k | £30.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.70k | £5.67k | £35.78k | £65.51k | £34.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS/STUDENTS AT BURNSIDE BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE COLLEGE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (RESOURCES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY NORTH TYNESIDE EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BURNSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnside Bus and Ent College
St. Peters Road
WALLSEND
Tyne And Wear
NE28 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01912598500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window